Position | Unit/Area | Begin Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
Coordenador | Department of Architecture and Urbanism | 2011-01-31 | 2013-07-07 |
Coordenador do 2º Ano | Integrated Master Degree in Architecture | 2011-01-31 | 2014-08-31 |
Membro (Docente) | Plenário da Comissão Científica | 2010-07-01 | 2013-07-01 |
Sub-diretor | Department of Architecture and Urbanism | 2010-05-27 | 2013-06-30 |
Membro (Docente) | Comissão Científica | 2010-05-27 | 2013-06-30 |
The information in this public profile may be outdated.