Position | Unit/Area | Begin Date | End Date |
---|---|---|---|
Director | Master Degree in Management of Services and Technology | 2017-01-31 | 2019-01-31 |
Coordenador | Doctorate Degree (PhD) in Management | 2016-01-31 | 2018-02-01 |
Director | Master Degree in Management of Services and Technology | 2015-02-01 | 2017-01-31 |
Director | Master Degree in Management of Services and Technology | 2013-01-31 | 2015-01-31 |
Director | Doctorate Degree (PhD) in Operations Management and Technology | 2011-09-01 | 2014-02-01 |
Director | Master Degree in Management of Services and Technology | 2011-09-01 | 2013-01-31 |
Director | Doctorate Degree (PhD) in Operations Management and Technology | 2010-09-01 | 2011-07-31 |
Director | Master Degree in Management of Services and Technology | 2010-09-01 | 2011-07-31 |
Academic Management Positions
Professional Associations
Association | Period |
---|---|
Portuguese Brasilian simulation Association | Since 2016 |
EurOMA | Since 1999 |
Ordem dos Engenheiros | Since 1986 |
Organization/Coordination of Events
Type of Organization/Coordination | Event Type | Event Title | Organizer | Period |
---|---|---|---|---|
Member of scientific event committee | Conference | Operations adding value to society | EurOMA 2019 | 2019 |
Coordination of non-scientific event | Other Type of Event | Automotive International Week DEZ2018 (BMW/Dingolfing; MAN/Munchen) | ISCTE-IUL/MMST | 2018 |
Member of scientific event committee | Other Type of Event | Scientific Committee of a PhD in Technological Innovation | UNIPA (University of Palermo) | 2018 - 2019 |
Coordination of non-scientific event | Other Type of Event | Automotive International Week JAN2018 (Mercedes/Sindelfingen; Frankfurt Airport/Logistics) | ISCTE-IUL/MMST | 2018 |
Coordination of non-scientific event | Other Type of Event | Automotive International Week JAN2017 (Mercedes Sindelfingen/Continental/Karben) | ISCTE-IUL/MMST | 2017 |
Coordination of scientific event (with scientific committee) at ISCTE-IUL | Other Type of Event | Double Degree MMST/Engineering Management | ISCTE-IUL and UNIPA/Palermo University | 2016 - 2019 |
Coordination of scientific event (with scientific committee) at ISCTE-IUL | Other Type of Event | Double Degree MMST/Kedge MSc | ISCTE-IUL and Kedge Business School (Bordeaux) | 2016 - 2019 |
Member of scientific event committee | Conference | Academy of Management 2013 Annual Meeting - Capitalism in Question | Academy of Management | 2013 |
Member of scientific event committee | Conference | Academy of Management 2012 Annual Meeting - The Informal Economy | Academy of Management | 2012 |
Member of scientific event committee | Conference | ICSB 2011 World Conference | International Council for Small Business | 2011 |
Member of scientific event committee | Conference | ICSB 2010 World Conference | International Council of Small Business | 2010 |
Member of scientific event's organizing committee | Conference | ICSB 2010 World Conference | International Council for Small Business | 2010 |
Scientific Editing/Reviewing Activities
Type of Activity | Journal Title | Journal ISSN | Quartile | Period | Language |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Member of scientific journal editing staff | Agronomy Research | 1406-894X | Q2 | 2019 | English |
Member of scientific journal editing staff | European Journal of Engineering Education | 0304-3797 | Q1 (T10) | 2017 | English |
Member of scientific journal editing staff | International Journal of Services Technology and Management (IJSTM) | 1460-6720 | Q4 | 2017 | English |
External Professional Activities
Employer | Country | Description | Period |
---|---|---|---|
ISCTE-IUL (GRH) | Portugal (Lisboa) | Roundtable Moderator (Moderating a session) | 2017 |
Escola Superior de Tecnologia e Gestão (ESTG) do Instituto Politécnico de Leiria | Afghanistan | Operations Management Seminar (speaker) (Operations Management Seminar) | 2016 |
Laboratório Nacional de Engenharia Civil (LNEC) | Afghanistan | Soft Systems Methodology Seminar (Speaker) (Soft Systems Methodology Seminar) | 2015 |
Universidade de Aveiro, Dep de Economia, Engenharia e Gestão Industrial | Afghanistan | PhD Assessment Panel (PhD Assessment Panel) | 2013 |
Other Professional Activities
Activity Type | Activity Description | More Info URL | Period |
---|---|---|---|
Service on Boards of Directors | Managing Director of its own business in reforestation and afforestation (without financial compensation/salary) | -- | 1997 - 2023 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Scientific Coordinator of ISCTE participation in a consortium for a Mobilising Project, SI IDT (INOVMINERAL 4.0) - PT2020 (Programas Mobilizadores do Sistema de Incentivos à Investigação e Desenvolvimento Tecnológico) (2020-2023) | View More | 2020 - 2023 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Visiting Professor at the Technische Hochschule Mittelhessen (Germany, 2022), Service Operations Management Course (20 lecturing hours-30 total hours) | -- | 2022 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Scientific Coordinator of ISCTE participation in a consortium for a Mobilising Project, SI IDT (INOVSTONE 4.0) - PT2020 (Programas Mobilizadores do Sistema de Incentivos à Investigação e Desenvolvimento Tecnológico) (2017-2020) | View More | 2017 - 2020 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Visiting Professor at the Technische Hochschule Mittelhessen (Germany, 2020), Service Operations Management Course (20 lecturing hours-30 total hours) | -- | 2020 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Visiting Professor at Universidade de Fortaleza/Fundação Edson Queiroz (Brasil, 2019). INOVAÇÃO para a SUSTENTABILIDADE no PROJETO INOVSTONE® 4.0 (1 day talk) | -- | 2019 |
Sustained professional work | Member of the Board of Directors of the Masters Programmes at ISCTE Business School (IBS/ISCTE-IUL) | -- | 2007 - 2019 |
Sustained professional work | Member of the Scientific Committee of the PhD in Management and/or Operations Management (ISCTE-IUL/BRU-IUL) | View More | 2008 - 2017 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Operations Management Talk (speaker) at Escola Superior de Tecnologia e Gestão (ESTG) of Instituto Politécnico de Leiria | -- | 2016 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Soft Systems Methodology Talk (Speaker) at Laboratório Nacional de Engenharia Civil (LNEC) | -- | 2015 |
Expert participation in other institutions | PhD Workshop at Departamento de Economia, Engenharia e Gestão Industrial (DEGEI) of Universidade de Aveiro | -- | 2013 |
Sustained professional work | Assistant Professor at Universidade Católica Portuguesa | -- | 1990 - 2007 |
Documented continuing professional education experiences | Teaching at FORINO - Escola de Novas Tecnologias (sites: Lisboa, Viseu and Mangualde) | View More | 2004 - 2007 |
Consulting activities | Coordinator of IS/IT expert panels of ADI; also acted as an Expert for ADI (Governmental Agency on Innovation) | View More | 2004 - 2007 |
Service on Boards of Directors | Managing Director of AgilTec (Research Firm in Precision Engineering) | -- | 2003 |
Consulting activities | Developing and Testing a Process of Enquiry to Identify Relevant Production Planning and Control Procedures at Tecnisata SA | View More | 1998 - 2000 |
Consulting activities | Systems Analyst and Project Manager at COTESI and CORFI (Grupo Violas). Project partners: MIPS and INETI | -- | 1990 - 1992 |
Consulting activities | Specifying the Requirements for Production Planning and Control Systems for Jobbing Shops at Tecnisata SA | View More | 1989 - 1990 |
Consulting activities | IS/IT Analyst at Plant of Southampton, Ford of Europe (UK) | -- | 1990 |
Sustained professional work | Technical duties as a Logistics Manager at the Logistics Department (DLI/Renault Portugal, French multinational) | -- | 1988 - 1989 |
Sustained professional work | Technical duties as a Mechanical Engineer at the Maintenance Department (Ferro Portugal, US multinational) | -- | 1987 - 1988 |
Consulting activities | Project Manager at Instituto Nacional de Engenharia e Tecnologia Industrial (LNETI/INETI) | -- | 1986 - 1987 |
Expert participation in other institutions | Mine.The.Gap evaluator | View More | Since 2021 |
Participation in business professional associations, professional standard setting of policy-making bodies | Portuguese Brasilian Simulation Association | -- | Since 2016 |
Consulting activities | Business Angel in a Hydroponics Greenhouse Entrepreneurship (Agriestufa project) | -- | Since 2015 |
Participation in business professional associations, professional standard setting of policy-making bodies | EurOMA - European Operations Management Association | -- | Since 1999 |
Participation in business professional associations, professional standard setting of policy-making bodies | Portuguese Institution of Engineers | -- | Since 1986 |